Quantitative Aptitude Problems with Solutions PDF




 (Number Series & Simplification) Problems :

Directions (Q. 1-5): what should come in place of question mark in the following number series?
1). 3, 14, 50, ?, 1534, 10747
a) 260
b) 458
c) 257
d) 267
e) 268

2). 543, 668, 704, 1047, ?, 1840
a) 1110
b) 1111
c) 1115
d) 1121
e) 1112

3). 71, 78, 149, 227, 376, 603, ?
a) 779
b) 879
c) 980
d) 979
e) 880

4). 88, 44, ?, 165, 577.5, 2598.75
a) 60
b) 62
c) 64
d) 68
e) 66

5) . 3, 9, 31, 129, ?, 3913
a) 651
b) 650
c) 550
d) 551
e) 457

Directions (Q. 6-10): What approximate value should come in place of question mark in the following questions? (you are not expected to calculate the exact value)
6). [ (√530 × 36.003) ÷ 47.987] × ? = 5863.10376
a) 640
b) 750
c) 340
d) 360
e) 680

7). (77.987 % of 358) + (68.55% of 729) = ?
a) 780
b) 705
c) 840
d) 825
e) 695

8). √624.995 + (4.9989)2 = ? ÷ (1 / 4.9900865)
a) 18
b) 34
c) 44
d) 10
e) 25

9). 989.001 + 1.00982 × 76.792 = ?
a) 1150
b) 1070
c) 1240
d) 1188
e) 1044

10). 63.9872 × 9449.8780 ÷ 243.003 = (?)2
a) 60
b) 75
c) 90
d) 40
e) 50

Explanation With Answers Key:
1). C) The series is 3 x3 + 5 = 14, 14 x 4 – 6 = 50,
50 x 5 + 7 = 257, 257 x 6 — 8 = 1534, 1534 x 7 + 9 = 10747,

2). B) The series is
543 + (5)3 = 668, 668 + (6)2 = 704, 704 + (7)3 = 1047, 1047 + (8)2 = 1111
1111 + (9)3 = 1840

3). D) Add the previous number to get the next number.
ie 71 + 78 = 149, 149 + 78 = 227, 227 + 149 = 376, 376 + 227 = 603, 603 + 376 = 979, …

4). E) The series is
88×0.5 = 44, 44×1.5 = 66, 66×2.5 = 165, 165×3.5 = 577.5, 577.5×4.5 = 2598.75

5). A) The series is
3 x 2 + 3 =9, 9 x 3 + 4 = 31, 31 x 4 + 5 = 129, 129 x 5 +6 = 651, 651 x 6+ 7 = 3913, …

6). C)
[( √530 x 36.003) ÷ 47.987] x ? = 5863.10376
? = 5863 / [( √529 x 36) ÷ 48] = 5863 / [(23 × 36) ÷ 48] = 340

7). A)
? = (77.987% of 358) + (68.55% of 729)
? = [(78/100) × 358] + [(69/100) × 725]
= 280 + 500 = 780

8). D)
√624.995 + (4.9989)2
= ? ÷ (1 / 4.9900865)
or, √625 + (5)2 = ? ÷ (1/5)
? = 1/5 (25 + 25) = 10

9). B)
? = 989.001 + 1.00982 × 76.792
= 990 + 1 x 76.8 = 1066.8 = 1070

10). B)
(?)2 = 63.9872 x 9449.8780 ÷ 243.0034
= 64 x 9450 ÷ 243 = 64 x 39 = 2496
Now, (?)2 = 2496

? = 50

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *